This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 15:00:58 (UTC).

Guardianship of Jacob Tekhin Oen

Case Summary

On 02/14/2007 Guardianship of Jacob Tekhin Oen was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH TRUTNER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1158

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELIZABETH TRUTNER

 

Party Details

Petitioners

OEN, JOSH

OEN, JOAN

Minor

OEN, JACOB TEKHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GREWAL, CHAMANDEEP K

 

Court Documents

Examiner's Notes re Petition for Guardianship of the Person for 8-24-07

8/15/2007: Examiner's Notes re Petition for Guardianship of the Person for 8-24-07

Examiner's Notes re Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person for 11-9-07

11/1/2007: Examiner's Notes re Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person for 11-9-07

Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian set for 2/15/08

2/6/2008: Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian set for 2/15/08

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2008
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2008
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2008
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian set for 2/15/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2007
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 02/15/2008 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes re Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person for 11-9-07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Josh Oen, Joan Oen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person; Judge: Elizabeth Trutner Pro Tem; Department: Dept 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • DocketHearing Continued to Probate dept: 602 date: 11/09/2007 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2007
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 08/24/2007 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 06/22/2007 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Josh Oen, Joan Oen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2007
  • DocketProbate Hearing Dropped from dept: 602 date: 04/27/2007 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2007
  • DocketProbate 05/11/2007 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketConsent of Guardian, Nomination, and Waiver of Notice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form Josh Oen Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form Joan Oen Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketProbate 04/27/2007 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person Filed

    Read MoreRead Less