This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 18:59:13 (UTC).

Guardianship of Asante Rene Day

Case Summary

On 03/12/2007 Guardianship of Asante Rene Day was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEITH FUDENNA and SHARON ISENHOUR,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5226

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

KEITH FUDENNA

SHARON ISENHOUR,

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIRTZ, TENNISHIA

Minor

DAY, ASANTE RENE

 

Court Documents

Examiner's Notes re for petition to appoint guardian on 8/10/07

8/6/2007: Examiner's Notes re for petition to appoint guardian on 8/10/07

Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian for petition to appoint guardian on 5/11/07

5/7/2007: Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian for petition to appoint guardian on 5/11/07

Probate Examiner's Check List Reconsideration of Temp Guardian set for 3/23 Filed

3/19/2007: Probate Examiner's Check List Reconsideration of Temp Guardian set for 3/23 Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2008
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Tennishia Kirtz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • DocketLetters of Guardianship Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Estate; Judge: Sharon Isenhour, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketDeclaration of R.L. Johnson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian of Minor Tennishia Kirtz Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Estate Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketTennishia Kirtz Appointed Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketMiscellaneous Stipulation to Temporary Judge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketGuardianship Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • DocketConfidential Court Investigator Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2007
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • DocketProbate 03/23/2007 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Tennishia Kirtz Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • DocketPetition for Temporary Guardianship - Estate Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketConfidential CI recommendation for exparte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Tennishia Kirtz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketPetition for Temporary Guardianship - Estate Filed by Tennishia Kirtz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketProbate 05/11/2007 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Estate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less