Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 11:37:15 (UTC).

Groth Bros.Olldsmobile, Inc. VS Leonis

Case Summary

On 01/19/2000 Groth Bros Olldsmobile, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Leonis. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9815

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

GROTH BROS.OLLDSMOBILE, INC.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

LEONIS, BRANDON

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1/19/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/2/2000: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

2/24/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

2/24/2000: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

2/24/2000: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Declaration of Non-Military Service Filed

2/24/2000: Declaration of Non-Military Service Filed

Judgment Entered

2/24/2000: Judgment Entered

Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

2/29/2000: Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/23/2000: Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

3/23/2000: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

3/23/2000: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

5/4/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

5/4/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/04/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2000
  • DocketMotion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Granted, trial is continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/23/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Brandon Leonis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 02/24/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less