Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 11:35:02 (UTC).

Greer-Thompson VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 Greer-Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT MCGUINESS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0257

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT MCGUINESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREER-THOMPSON, BERYL

Defendants

CITY OF OAKLAND

KADOYA, KEIKO

ATCHESON, REMINGTON H.

COMCAST OD CALIFORNIA \COLORADO LLC

THE MARTIN GROUP OF COMPANIES, LLC

COMCAST OF CALIFORNIA \COLORADO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BACHAN, JAMES

PARKER, BARBARA J.

WENZEL, MICHAEL C

BEARY JR, LOUIS G.

KIRRANE, MICHELE C.

MORIARTY, DENNIS F

BIGLEY, PAUL A.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Remington H. Atcheson, Keiko Kadoya Filed

11/10/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Remington H. Atcheson, Keiko Kadoya Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Comcast of California \Colorado LLC

11/13/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Comcast of California \Colorado LLC

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Comcast of California \Colorado LLC Filed

11/2/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Comcast of California \Colorado LLC Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

10/23/2020: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

7/24/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

Substitution of Attorney Filed for City of Oakland

6/12/2020: Substitution of Attorney Filed for City of Oakland

Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 10/05/2020 08:30 AM D- 22

4/1/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 10/05/2020 08:30 AM D- 22

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Beryl Greer-Thompson

1/15/2020: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Beryl Greer-Thompson

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

11/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

11/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/23/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/23/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

4/22/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed

3/29/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/12/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

3/8/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/8/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: The Martin Group of Companies, LLC Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party The Martin Group of Companies, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Remington H. Atcheson, Keiko Kadoya Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Comcast of California \Colorado LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Remington H. Atcheson, Keiko Kadoya Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Comcast of California \Colorado LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Beryl Greer-Thompson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorneys Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/23/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Beryl Greer-Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MARTIN GROUP OF COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST OF CALIFORNIA/COLORADO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRRANE, MICHELE C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WENZEL, MICHAEL C