This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 09:34:46 (UTC).

Greenwell VS Envigo RMS,LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Greenwell filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Envigo RMS,LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8069

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENWELL, JACOB

Defendant

ENVIGO RMS,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ALWAZIAN, EDWIN

GROODE, STEVE A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/10/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/01/2022 03:00 PM D- 20

8/10/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/01/2022 03:00 PM D- 20

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/25/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jacob Greenwell

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jacob Greenwell

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

6/25/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

9/22/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Envigo RMS,LLC

9/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Envigo RMS,LLC

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

9/28/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

9/27/2021: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 02/02/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Envigo RMS,LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Envigo RMS,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/01/2022 03:00 PM D- 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jacob Greenwell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVIGO RMS,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROODE STEVEN ANDREW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN