This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 23:05:05 (UTC).

Greenwell VS Envigo RMS, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Greenwell filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Envigo RMS, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Nol Wise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7600

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Nol Wise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Greenwell

Defendant

ENVIGO RMS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ALWAZIAN, EDWIN

GROODE, STEVE A.

Edwin Alwazian

Steve A. Groode

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

8/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

02/02/2022: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

02/02/2022: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

01/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings

01/13/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings)

01/13/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings)

Declaration Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Stay

12/30/2021: Declaration Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Stay

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/30/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice

12/30/2021: Opposition Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition Opposition to Motion to Stay

12/30/2021: Opposition Opposition to Motion to Stay

Reply Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings

01/06/2022: Reply Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings

Request for Judicial Notice

10/22/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Posting

10/22/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings

10/22/2021: Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/22/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Order Notice and Motion to Stay Proceedings

10/22/2021: Motion for Order Notice and Motion to Stay Proceedings

General Order (Case Management Order)

10/19/2021: General Order (Case Management Order)

Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

09/27/2021: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Jacob Greenwell (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Reply Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Filed by: Envigo RMS, LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Order Motion to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Envigo RMS, LLC; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jacob Greenwell; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVIGO RMS,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN