This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 00:45:03 (UTC).

GRAY VS AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 GRAY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICK R. MCKINNEY II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7710

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY, GREGORY

Defendants

SUTTER HEALTH

THE SURGERY CENTER OF ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

SUTTER HEALTH PLAN

SUTTER HEALTH PACIFIC

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC.

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER

THE SUMMIT MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC.

SUMMIT MEDICAL, INC.

SUTTER BAY HOSPITALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COHEN, MICHAEL C.

MARSH, BARRY C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/21/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/21/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/21/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

2/5/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/21/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

Proof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. Filed

5/3/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC. Filed

5/3/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Filed

5/3/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/23/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

9/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Case Management Statement of AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Filed

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement of AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/7/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Statement of GREGORY GRAY Filed

9/7/2021: Case Management Statement of GREGORY GRAY Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

9/17/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Notice of Jury Fee Doposit Filed

4/19/2021: Notice of Jury Fee Doposit Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

4/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

2/3/2021: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for GREGORY GRAY

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for GREGORY GRAY

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/3/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/5/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Patrick R. McKinney II; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/16/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of GREGORY GRAY Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Doposit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/21/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for GREGORY GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH PACIFIC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUMMIT MEDICAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant