This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/16/2020 at 03:53:40 (UTC).

Goolsby VS San Leandro Dodge

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Goolsby filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against San Leandro Dodge. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONNI MACLAREN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1506

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONNI MACLAREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOOLSBY, NORMAN

Defendant

SAN LEANDRO DODGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCLEOD, BRADY D

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10/18/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/10/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/19/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/19/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for San Leandro Dodge

9/4/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for San Leandro Dodge

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

9/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Statement of San Leandro Dodge Filed

9/4/2019: Case Management Statement of San Leandro Dodge Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

9/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service (Amended) on Complaint As to San Leandro Dodge Filed

8/5/2019: Proof of Service (Amended) on Complaint As to San Leandro Dodge Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/1/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/1/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

4/18/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to San Leandro Dodge Filed

3/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to San Leandro Dodge Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

3/20/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 08/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/20/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Norman Goolsby

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Norman Goolsby

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/19/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

3/19/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Ronni MacLaren; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/24/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Ronni MacLaren; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/10/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Norman Goolsby Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to San Leandro Dodge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Norman Goolsby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Norman Goolsby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLEOD BRADY DEAN