This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 19:13:36 (UTC).

Gonzalez VS Abi Services Inc., a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Gonzalez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Abi Services Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9162

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Carlos Gonzalez

Defendants

ABI SERVICES INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

A BRIGHT IDEA

WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC

Mark William Spahn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

David L. Price

William E Donahoo

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

3/22/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

1/22/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Case Management Conference; Notice of Case Assignment Filed

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference; Notice of Case Assignment Filed

Case Management Order

11/18/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/18/2021: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

11/04/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/07/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

07/06/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

05/28/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

05/20/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Case Management Conference Order Issued

09/07/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

07/06/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 11/18/2021 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Juan Carlos Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance 09/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference; Notice of Case Assignment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMessage: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 02/08/2021 02:30 PM D- 22; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Juan Carlos Gonzalez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less