This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 00:13:05 (UTC).

Gonzales VS Gonzales

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Gonzales filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gonzales. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8535

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALES, MARIA

GONZALES, RODOLFO

Defendant

GONZALES, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

YEREMIAN, DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

5/10/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rodolfo Gonzales

5/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rodolfo Gonzales

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/10/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

5/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/12/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rodolfo Gonzales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEREMIAN, DAVID