Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 04:22:56 (UTC).

Gonzales VS Gonzales

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Gonzales filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against Gonzales. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEITH FONG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5547

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

KEITH FONG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALES, MARIE

Respondent

GONZALES, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PALAZZOLO, MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Protective Order (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse); Judge: Keith Fong; Department: Dept 502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Cancelled Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Protective Order (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse) As to An

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing 05/05/2021 10:00 AM D- 502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Elder Abuse) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) Filed for Marie Gonzales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Protective Order (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less