This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 05:01:04 (UTC).

Goins VS Induspac California, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Goins filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Induspac California, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT MCGUINESS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4700

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT MCGUINESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOINS, SHANANDREA

Defendant

INDUSPAC CALIFORNIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DREGER, KURT W.

AGUIAR, LISA E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

3/16/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/3/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

5/20/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

5/21/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/17/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/17/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Shanandrea Goins Filed

5/21/2019: Case Management Statement of Shanandrea Goins Filed

Proof of Service by Electronic Service re: Case Management Statement Filed

5/21/2019: Proof of Service by Electronic Service re: Case Management Statement Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/17/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

5/24/2019: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/17/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

Case Management Statement of Induspac California, Inc. Filed

5/28/2019: Case Management Statement of Induspac California, Inc. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Induspac California, Inc.

2/15/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Induspac California, Inc.

Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

2/20/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/20/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Induspac California, Inc. Filed

2/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Induspac California, Inc. Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

2/1/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shanandrea Goins

1/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shanandrea Goins

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

1/29/2019: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 303 date: 06/02/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/10/2020 08:30 AM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Robert McGuiness; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/02/2020 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/17/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Electronic Service re: Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Shanandrea Goins Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Induspac California, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Induspac California, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shanandrea Goins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDUSPAC CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa E. Aguiar