Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/17/2020 at 01:42:16 (UTC).

Glieden VS Honeywell International Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Glieden filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Honeywell International Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WINIFRED Y. SMITH and ROBERT MCGUINESS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6151

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

ROBERT MCGUINESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GLIEDEN, LLOYD

GLIEDEN, BEVERLEY

Defendants

CONNELL MOTOR CO.

FITZPATRICK CHEVROLET, INC.

BILL COX, INC.

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

PERFECTION HY-TEST COMPANY

AUTOMOTIVE EXCHANGE SERVICE, INC.

BRIAN BUICK

F.E. PERI, INC.

LEHMER'S

GENUIE PARTS COMPANY

ANDERSON OLDSMOBILE-GMC

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

MAZZEI PONTIAC-CADILLAC CO.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

WAYNE STEAD CADILLAC, INC.

GOOD CHEVROLET

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOSI, JUSTIN

BLAIR, LYNNE P.

BRYDON, JOHN R.

LOVE, MARK A

TAVERA, LEONARD M.

HARAN, GINA A

MAJD, NILUFAR K.

MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A

SPANGLER, VIJU C

HARTLEY, EDWARD E.

BIBBES, KIRSTEN MCNELLY

TURNER, GLEN

LANKFORD, PAUL V.

DIVINE, JOSHUA J.

PRZETAK, LAURA

WILLIAMS, MONICA D.

KORT, JASON A.

 

Court Documents

Tentative Case Management Order

12/12/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Connell Motor Co. Filed

12/3/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Connell Motor Co. Filed

Proof of Service by Mail / Electronic Service Filed

1/6/2020: Proof of Service by Mail / Electronic Service Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

12/27/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Automotive Exchange Service, Inc. Filed

12/23/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Automotive Exchange Service, Inc. Filed

Proposed Order Filed

12/6/2019: Proposed Order Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

11/1/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed for Fitzpatrick Chevrolet, Inc.

11/1/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed for Fitzpatrick Chevrolet, Inc.

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

8/13/2019: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

4/24/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Genuine Parts Company Filed

4/17/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Genuine Parts Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Parker-Hannifin Corporation Filed

4/16/2019: Case Management Statement of Parker-Hannifin Corporation Filed

Association of Attorneys Filed

4/11/2019: Association of Attorneys Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

3/19/2019: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Bill Cox, Inc. Filed

3/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Bill Cox, Inc. Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Anderson Oldsmobile-GMC Filed

2/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Anderson Oldsmobile-GMC Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Wayne Stead Cadillac, Inc. Filed

2/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Wayne Stead Cadillac, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Perfection Hy-Test Company Filed

2/19/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Perfection Hy-Test Company Filed

247 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Connell Motor Co. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Good Chevrolet Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Connell Motor Co. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Good Chevrolet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Lloyd Glieden, Beverley Glieden Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Anderson Oldsmobile-GMC, Bill Cox, Inc., Brian Buick, F.E. Peri, Inc., Fi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Anderson Oldsmobile-GMC, Bill Cox, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Honeywell International Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Honeywell International Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
384 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Parker-Hannifin Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Genuie Parts Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 03/26/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Honeywell International Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wayne Stead Cadillac, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lloyd Glieden

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFECTION HY TEST COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY is a litigant

Latest cases where WAYNE STEAD CADILLAC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOMOTIVE EXCHANGE SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. is a litigant