This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 23:09:56 (UTC).

Gilbert VS Adams

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Gilbert filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Adams. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Patrick McKinney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2680

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Patrick McKinney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Will Lightbourne

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Charlene Adams

Michael Cohen

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Charlene Adams

Lisset Mitre

Michael Cohen

Bradley P Gilbert

Will Lightbourne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Katherine Grainger

Kayla E. Berlin

Mark E Inbody

Maryam Toossi

Michael Cohen

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/8/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/26/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/2/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/27/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

05/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer

05/16/2022: Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer

Request for Judicial Notice

05/16/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

05/16/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

05/16/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Substituting Michelle Baass for Will Lightbourne

05/12/2022: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Substituting Michelle Baass for Will Lightbourne

General Order (Case Management Order)

04/05/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Case Management Statement

04/04/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

02/28/2022: Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

02/15/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

02/15/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

Case Management Order

02/15/2022: Case Management Order

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Will Lightbourne (Cross-Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/02/2022 at 01:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 15; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by: Will Lightbourne (Cross-Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Will Lightbourne (Cross-Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Will Lightbourne (Cross-Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by: Will Lightbourne (Cross-Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Substituting Michelle Baass for Will Lightbourne: Result: Granted Result Date: 05/12/2022; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Substituting Michelle Baass for Will Lightbourne: Status Date changed from 05/11/2022 to 05/12/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Substituting Michelle Baass for Will Lightbourne Filed and Received by: Will Lightbourne (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/02/2022 01:30 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons Issued and Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMessage: Cross-Complaint Filed for CSAA Insurance Exchange; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for AAA Northern California, Nevada, & Utah, Insurance Exchange; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/02/2020 02:30 PM D- 518; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bradley P. Gilbert; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA Insurance Exchange is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERLIN, KAYLA E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Inbody, Mark