This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 03:08:09 (UTC).

Genoese Development, LLC a Ca VS Pakhwa,Corp, a California C

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Genoese Development, LLC a Ca filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pakhwa,Corp, a California C. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1953

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GENOESE DEVELOPMENT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VARNI, ANTHONY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HOPE BANCORP, INC, A DELAWARE CORP

PAKHWA,CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORP

BANK OF HOPE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ASHLEY, EUGENE

HANN, JAMES C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

5/11/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/11/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

4/2/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/11/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

2/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

9/10/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

9/30/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

Proof of Service by Mail Electronic Filed

9/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Electronic Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Pakhwa,Corp, a California Corp

6/30/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Pakhwa,Corp, a California Corp

Notice of Change of address Filed

5/28/2021: Notice of Change of address Filed

Proof of Service Filed

3/1/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Case Management Statement of Genoese Development, LLC a California limited liability company Filed

1/25/2021: Case Management Statement of Genoese Development, LLC a California limited liability company Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

2/9/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Genoese Development, LLC a California limited liability company Filed

12/21/2020: Case Management Statement of Genoese Development, LLC a California limited liability company Filed

Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

11/15/2020: Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

Proof of Service of Ex Parte Application for Extension Filed

10/22/2020: Proof of Service of Ex Parte Application for Extension Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for Pakhwa,Corp, a California Corp, Hope Bancorp,

10/23/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for Pakhwa,Corp, a California Corp, Hope Bancorp,

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Genoese Development, L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDemurrer to the First Amended Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 22 date: 11/04/2021 time: 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Electronic Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Genoese Development, LLC a California limited liability company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Extension of Time Filed for Pakhwa,Corp, a California Corp, Hope Bancorp, INC, a Del

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Ex Parte Application for Extension Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/05/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Genoese Development, LLC a California limited liability company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOPE BANKCORP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK OF HOPE is a litigant