This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 22:47:02 (UTC).

GENL MOTORS ACCEPT VS VAILEA

Case Summary

On 11/15/1996 GENL MOTORS ACCEPT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VAILEA. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN DOMBRINK and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0390

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/1996

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wiley W Manuel Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEPHEN DOMBRINK

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

VAILEA, NGATUVAI INDIVIDUALLY

VAILEA, ONISEMA INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES G SCHWARTZ

 

Court Documents

Civil OSC - Complaints 07/29/1997 02:00 PM D- 14

7/17/1997: Civil OSC - Complaints 07/29/1997 02:00 PM D- 14

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

7/29/1997: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Request for Entry of Default Filed for GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, ONISEMA INDIVIDUALLY V

7/30/1997: Request for Entry of Default Filed for GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, ONISEMA INDIVIDUALLY V

Declaration for Judgment by Court (CCP 585 (d) ) Filed

7/30/1997: Declaration for Judgment by Court (CCP 585 (d) ) Filed

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

8/12/1997: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

8/20/1997: Judgment Entered

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

5/18/2000: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

11/20/2000: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2000
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1997
  • DocketDeclaration for Judgment by Court (CCP 585 (d) ) Reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1997
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Breach of Contract; Judge: Stephen Dombrink; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/1997
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default As to GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, ONISEMA INDIVIDUALLY VAILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Judgment by Court (CCP 585 (d) ) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Filed for GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, ONISEMA INDIVIDUALLY V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/1997
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Breach of Contract; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/1997
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 08/12/1997 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 07/29/1997 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/1997
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/1996
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less