This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:56:19 (UTC).

Gemeiner VS Ngan

Case Summary

On 04/24/1998 Gemeiner filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ngan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8842

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

GEMEINER, CONNIE

GEMEINER, MARK

Defendants and Others

NGAN, CINDY

NGAN, KEN

 

Court Documents

Order Destruction of Exhibits Filed

5/15/2003: Order Destruction of Exhibits Filed

Miscellaneous Notice of Release/Destruction of Exhibits Filed

2/26/2003: Miscellaneous Notice of Release/Destruction of Exhibits Filed

Judgment Entered

6/25/1998: Judgment Entered

Ruling Taken Under Submission

5/27/1998: Ruling Taken Under Submission

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

5/27/1998: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/29/1998: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/29/1998: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/24/1998: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Destruction of Exhibits Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Notice of Release/Destruction of Exhibits Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/1998
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Fremont Judge Pro Tem; Department: Dept 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1998
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Ken Ngan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1998
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Cindy Ngan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/1998
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/1998
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/1998
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/27/1998 06:30 PM D- 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less