This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 05:48:11 (UTC).

Galligan VS Chicago Title Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Galligan filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Chicago Title Insurance Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0569

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

GALLIGAN, PATRICK T.

Defendants and Others

EDEN TOOTHMAN

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

CHICAGO TITLE LAND TRUST COMPANY

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GALLIGAN, PATRICK T.

FANADY, KIMBERLY A.

FANADY, KIMBERLY

JOHNSON, JOSETTE D.

 

Court Documents

Receipt for Record on Appeal of Chicago Title Insurance Company Filed

9/20/2021: Receipt for Record on Appeal of Chicago Title Insurance Company Filed

Billing Notice Filed

9/2/2021: Billing Notice Filed

Notice of Certification of Record Filed

9/15/2021: Notice of Certification of Record Filed

Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Creditor Filed

6/17/2021: Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Creditor Filed

Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed

6/10/2021: Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

6/1/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Patrick T. Galligan

6/1/2021: Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Patrick T. Galligan

Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued

6/3/2021: Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued

Judgment Entered

5/20/2021: Judgment Entered

Notice of Change of Address Filed

10/7/2019: Notice of Change of Address Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

10/18/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Patrick T. Galligan Filed

10/18/2019: Case Management Statement of Patrick T. Galligan Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

6/21/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

5/28/2019: Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

5/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/28/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 11/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

5/29/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 11/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/29/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Record on Appeal of Chicago Title Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Certification of Record Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBilling Notice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Record on Appeal by Creditor Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Patrick T. Galligan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/06/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Patrick T. Galligan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patrick T. Galligan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FANADY, KIMBERLY A.