This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 19:26:20 (UTC).

Gaines-Perkins VS Cordis Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 Gaines-Perkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cordis Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2814

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PASSARELLA, MARK

LEDOUX, CONNIE

HUNTER, JACQUELINE

PASSARELLA, CHRISTINA

GAINES-PERKINS, TEMPERANCE

DAVIS, NANCY

HOLBROOKS, SHELLY

Defendants

CONFLUENT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

CORDIS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GARCIA, NOEL E.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

4/28/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

4/28/2020: Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

3/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cordis Corporation Filed

2/18/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cordis Corporation Filed

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

2/11/2020: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Complaint - Product Liability Filed

1/30/2020: Complaint - Product Liability Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/30/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Temperance Gaines-Perkins

1/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Temperance Gaines-Perkins

Case Management Conference 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

2/3/2020: Case Management Conference 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Complaint - Product Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketTR - Complaint - Product Liability - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Cordis Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 03/18/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Product Liability Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Temperance Gaines-Perkins

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.