This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 08:36:40 (UTC).

Freshko Produce Services Inc VS Moraga Produce and Grocery

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Freshko Produce Services Inc filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against Moraga Produce and Grocery. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2408

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRESHKO PRODUCE SERVICES INC

Respondents

HOMRAN , ABRAHIM

MORAGA PRODUCE AND GROVERY INC

MORAGA PRODUCE AND GROCERY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VOTE, KURT F

 

Court Documents

OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $250

10/1/2020: OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $250

OEX - Continued

9/17/2020: OEX - Continued

OEX - Continued

8/27/2020: OEX - Continued

Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 08/27/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

6/24/2020: Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 08/27/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 08/25/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

5/6/2020: Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 08/25/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 06/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

3/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 06/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

2/10/2020: Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Freshko Produce Services Inc

1/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Freshko Produce Services Inc

Petition - Other Filed

1/29/2020: Petition - Other Filed

Civil Order of Examination (Order) Issued

1/29/2020: Civil Order of Examination (Order) Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Petition - Other; Judge: Victoria S. Kolakowski; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $250

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Petition - Other; Judge: Victoria S. Kolakowski; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Order of Examination dept: 512 date: 10/01/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Petition - Other; Judge: Victoria S. Kolakowski; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Order of Examination dept: 512 date: 09/17/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Order of Examination 08/27/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Order of Examination 08/25/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Order of Examination 06/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketOrder of Examination 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Order of Examination (Order) Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Freshko Produce Services Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vote, Kurt F.