This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 04:53:14 (UTC).

Fraser VS FPI Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Fraser filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against FPI Management, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5354

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRASER, IESHA

FRASER, ILIANA

FRASER, IAN

FRASER, IAN JR.

Defendants

LEE, SHIU-KAI

FPI MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HIGGINBOTHAM, EDWARD M.

O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

OBERRECHT ESQ, KIMBERLY S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/24/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/15/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/15/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

12/10/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

8/9/2021: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

Case Management Statement of Shiu-Kai Lee Filed

8/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Shiu-Kai Lee Filed

Case Management Statement of FPI Management, Inc. Filed

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement of FPI Management, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Ian Fraser, Iesha Fraser, Iliana Fraser, Ian Fraser Jr. Filed

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement of Ian Fraser, Iesha Fraser, Iliana Fraser, Ian Fraser Jr. Filed

Proof of Service by Mail on Deft's Answer to the Complaint Filed

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail on Deft's Answer to the Complaint Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for FPI Management, Inc.

6/29/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for FPI Management, Inc.

Case Management Statement of Ian Fraser, Iesha Fraser, Iliana Fraser, Ian Fraser Jr. Filed

5/18/2021: Case Management Statement of Ian Fraser, Iesha Fraser, Iliana Fraser, Ian Fraser Jr. Filed

Case Management Statement of Shiu-Kai Lee Filed

5/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Shiu-Kai Lee Filed

Case Management Statement of FPI Management, Inc. Filed

5/21/2021: Case Management Statement of FPI Management, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Shiu-Kai Lee Filed

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement of Shiu-Kai Lee Filed

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/03/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 09/19/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 09/09/2022 01:30 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to FPI Management, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/23/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ian Fraser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HIGGINBOTHAM, EDWARD M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE