Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 03:15:39 (UTC).

Foster VS Siverls

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Foster filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Siverls. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4013

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOSTER, RITA

Defendants

SIVERLS, RONALD

SIVERLS, RAMONA RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BREKHUS, MATTHEW D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/7/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

3/5/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of Rita Foster Filed

3/2/2021: Case Management Statement of Rita Foster Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/4/2021: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Ronald Siverls, Ramona Rodriguez Siverls Filed

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Ronald Siverls, Ramona Rodriguez Siverls Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/7/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

11/22/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/22/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/20/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rita Foster

11/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rita Foster

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Rita Foster Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 03/04/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSanctions Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/19/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rita Foster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREKHUS, MATTHEW D