Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 02:50:13 (UTC).

Five J Investments, LLC VS Kam

Case Summary

On 04/24/2018 Five J Investments, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Kam. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS HAYASHI and THOMAS RASCH. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1974

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

DENNIS HAYASHI

THOMAS RASCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FIVE J INVESTMENTS, LLC

BRODSKY, JOAN S.

BRODSKY , JOEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GREENBLUM, MEECHAL

KAM, NA'AMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M

WOLFF, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Tentative Case Management Order

11/16/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

11/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Initial Case Management Conference 09/10/2018 02:30 PM D- 518

4/30/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 09/10/2018 02:30 PM D- 518

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

11/13/2020: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Motion in Limine to Preclude Intro of any Evidence Not Previously Disclosed in Discovery Filed

11/10/2020: Motion in Limine to Preclude Intro of any Evidence Not Previously Disclosed in Discovery Filed

Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed

11/10/2020: Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed

First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

9/22/2020: First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Leave To File Stipulated First Amended Cross Complaint

9/10/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Leave To File Stipulated First Amended Cross Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

2/7/2020: Amendment to Cross-Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

2/7/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

4/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/16/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/16/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

10/17/2018: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

9/5/2018: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/10/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

8/22/2018: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Five J Investments, LLC Rejected

8/16/2018: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Five J Investments, LLC Rejected

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion to Compel (Motion) 01/14/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 11/30/2020 08:45 AM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 11/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 03/16/2021 03:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Settlement Conference; Judge: Thomas Rasch; Department: Dept 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketKam & Greenblum's Witness List Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketKam & Greenblum's Voir Dire Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Na'Aman Kam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Meechal Greenblum Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Meechal Greenblum, Na'Aman Kam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Meechal Greenblum, Na'Aman Kam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/10/2018 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Five J Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIVE J INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M