This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 01:46:52 (UTC).

Fischer VS Pane

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Fischer filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pane. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENTRISH A SATARZADEH and KARIN S SCHWARTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7938

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BENTRISH A SATARZADEH

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

FISCHER, MARSHA

CIRIMELE, MICHAEL

Defendants and Others

PANE, JAMES GUY

COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT

PANE, DIANE CHRISTINE

WALSH PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

COLUMBIA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

COLUMBIA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/10/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/10/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/10/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/10/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

12/10/2019: Judgment Entered

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

9/30/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

9/30/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

9/30/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/22/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Columbia Community Association Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Community Association Management Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Walsh Property Management Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/10/2019 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish A Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 511 date: 12/10/2019 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 09/30/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 09/30/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALSH PROPERTY MANAGMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT is a litigant