This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 03:43:52 (UTC).

Fidelity National Title Compa VS Henry and Henry Adult Activ

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Fidelity National Title Compa filed an Other lawsuit against Henry and Henry Adult Activ. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3723

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MULUGETA, BENYAM

HENRY AND HENRY ADULT ACTIVITY CENTER

MULUGETA, PAULA R

HENRY, ALLEN

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

HENRY, ALLEN

HENRY, SELINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HERSHORIN, LORI C.

LUNSKI, RON U

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

5/10/2021: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

5/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Notice of of Case Management Conference Hearing; Notice of Judicial Assignment Filed

1/5/2021: Notice of of Case Management Conference Hearing; Notice of Judicial Assignment Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

12/30/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 05/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Case Management Statement of Fidelity National Title Company Filed

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement of Fidelity National Title Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Allen Henry Filed

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement of Allen Henry Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

7/2/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Benyam Mulugeta Filed

4/7/2021: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Benyam Mulugeta Filed

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

3/23/2021: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Cross-Complaint Filed for Allen Henry, Selina Henry

2/16/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Allen Henry, Selina Henry

Answer to Complaint Filed for Henry and Henry Adult Activity Center

2/16/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Henry and Henry Adult Activity Center

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paula R Mulugeta Filed

1/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paula R Mulugeta Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

1/6/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/10/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Fidelity National Title Company

12/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Fidelity National Title Company

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/30/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Allen Henry Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Fidelity National Title Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Stip for Discharge and Dismissal of Plntf. Release of Funds Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - For Discharge And Dismissal Of Plt. And Release

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Benyam Mulugeta Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Henry and Henry Adult Activity Center Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Case Management Conference Hearing; Notice of Judicial Assignment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Deposit of Funds in Interpleader Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Fidelity National Title Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERSHORIN, LORI C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUNSKI, RON U