This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:48:51 (UTC).

Fiaz VS Dattani

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Fiaz filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dattani. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2582

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIAZ, SARYEN

Defendant

DATTANI, KAUSHIK M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOWLES, RICHARD T.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Granted

10/6/2021: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Granted

Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Filed for Saryen Fiaz

9/21/2021: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Filed for Saryen Fiaz

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

9/13/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Saryen Fiaz

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Saryen Fiaz

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/13/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 01/26/2022 09:30 AM D- 520

9/14/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/26/2022 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/14/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Filed for Saryen Fiaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/26/2022 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Saryen Fiaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWLES, RICHARD T.