This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 21:20:47 (UTC).

Fiandor VS Pasos

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Fiandor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pasos. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jeffrey Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5931

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jeffrey Brand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Orste Fiandor

Defendant

Douglas Pasos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Anjali Talwar Nagpal

Courtney H O'Brien

Eric S. Ritigstein

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 02/28/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

7/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/28/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Mediator Selection (CAM)

04/25/2022: Notice of Mediator Selection (CAM)

Notice of Mediator Selection Form

04/25/2022: Notice of Mediator Selection Form

Notice of Mediator Selection Form

04/06/2022: Notice of Mediator Selection Form

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

02/28/2022: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

02/28/2022: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

02/09/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

02/09/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

01/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney Filed

10/05/2021: Notice of Change in Handling Attorney Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Douglas Pasos Filed

09/03/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Douglas Pasos Filed

Jury Fees Posting Filed

09/02/2021: Jury Fees Posting Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Pasos

09/02/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Pasos

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

07/23/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/28/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

07/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/28/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

06/01/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseph Orste Fiandor

06/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseph Orste Fiandor

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Joseph Orste Fiandor (Plaintiff) As to: Joseph Orste Fiandor (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Emailed Emailed confirmation of non-panel mediator selection. to Douglas Pasos (Anjali.Nagpal@csaa.com); Category: ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Emailed Emailed confirmation of non-panel mediator selection. to Joseph Orste Fiandor (eritigstein@boxerlaw.com); Category: ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Non-panel mediator David Samuelson assigned to 02/28/2022 Private Mediation.; Category: ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Mediator Selection (CAM) Filed by: Douglas Pasos (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Emailed Notice of Mediator Selection reminder email to Douglas Pasos (Anjali.Nagpal@csaa.com); Category: ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Emailed Notice of Mediator Selection reminder email to Joseph Orste Fiandor (eritigstein@boxerlaw.com); Category: ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Douglas Pasos (Defendant):Name Suffix: blankMiddle Name: blank; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Joseph Orste Fiandor (Plaintiff):Name Suffix: blank; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: 02/28/2022 Private Mediation status changed to Selection Filed; Category: ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Douglas Pasos (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change in Handling Attorney Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Douglas Pasos Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Jury Fees Posting Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Pasos; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 02/28/2022 02:30 PM D- 22; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseph Orste Fiandor; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less