Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 04:04:05 (UTC).

Ferreiro VS Big 5, Corp.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Ferreiro filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Big 5, Corp. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE and RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4618

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERREIRO , ANTHONY

Defendants

BIG 5, CORP.

MAX SALES GROUP, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMITH, EVAN J.

HANEY, STEVEN H.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Big 5, Corp., Max Sales Group, Inc Filed

12/18/2020: Case Management Statement of Big 5, Corp., Max Sales Group, Inc Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

11/20/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

Order Approving Proposition 65 Settlement and Consent Judgment Filed

9/23/2020: Order Approving Proposition 65 Settlement and Consent Judgment Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/23/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion To Approve Proposition65 Settlement and Consent Judgment Granted

9/23/2020: Motion To Approve Proposition65 Settlement and Consent Judgment Granted

First Amended Complaint Filed

7/17/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/21/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Rejection Letter Issued on First Amended Complaint

5/26/2020: Rejection Letter Issued on First Amended Complaint

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

5/5/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Re-Notice of jury fees Filed

11/12/2019: Re-Notice of jury fees Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/8/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/8/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Big 5, Corp. Filed

4/26/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Big 5, Corp. Filed

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Big 5, Corp. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Big 5, Corp., Max Sales Group, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Big 5, Corp. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Anthony Ferreiro Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Anthony Ferreiro Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Big 5, Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Big 5, Corp. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/30/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anthony Ferreiro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Max Sales Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG 5 CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH EVAN JASON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANEY STEVEN HAROLD