Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 08:41:41 (UTC).

Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. VS Wheeler

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Ferrari Financial Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wheeler. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9479

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

WHEELER, JAMES E IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SILVERMAN, TIMOTHY J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

8/13/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed

5/11/2020: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed

Case Management Statement of Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. Filed

4/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

4/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/28/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Writ of Possession (Claim & Delivery) - Unsatisfied Filed

10/28/2019: Writ of Possession (Claim & Delivery) - Unsatisfied Filed

Proof of Service -Case Management Statement Filed

10/7/2019: Proof of Service -Case Management Statement Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party James E Wheeler IV Filed

9/9/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party James E Wheeler IV Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/22/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Order granting Writ of Possession Filed

8/22/2019: Order granting Writ of Possession Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to James E Wheeler IV Filed

6/25/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to James E Wheeler IV Filed

Complaint - Collections Filed

5/17/2019: Complaint - Collections Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.

5/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/17/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Statement of Venue Filed

5/17/2019: Statement of Venue Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/28/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

5/20/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 10/28/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/20/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Application for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

5/22/2019: Application for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDefault Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to James E Wheeler IV Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Hearing Confirmed for 08/22/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/28/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVERMAN TIMOTHY J