This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 16:03:25 (UTC).

Fernandez VS Wu

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Fernandez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Wu. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TAMIZA HOCKENHULL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8297

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

TAMIZA HOCKENHULL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERNANDEZ, PEDRO

Defendants

WU, WINGPUT

TRULIA INC,

CORREIA, TIM

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1/21/2021: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

4/19/2021: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

4/19/2021: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Tamiza Hockenhull; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 04/19/2021 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRULIA INC, is a litigant