This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/15/2021 at 06:29:20 (UTC).

Farias VS Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Farias filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3713

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARIAS, ANDREA

Defendant

METTLER- TOLEDO RAININ, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KIM, MICHAEL H.

AUSTIN, NATHAN W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/10/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

6/10/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 11/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/5/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrea Farias

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrea Farias

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

6/5/2020: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

8/5/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC

9/14/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Andrea Farias Filed

10/30/2020: Case Management Statement of Andrea Farias Filed

Case Management Statement of Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

10/30/2020: Case Management Statement of Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

12/21/2020: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Termination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/17/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 06/13/2022 08:45 AM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Andrea Farias Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mettler- Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrea Farias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METTLER-TOLEDO RAININ, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUSTIN NATHAN WADE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, MICHAEL H