This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 15:49:53 (UTC).

Fair VS Harris

Case Summary

On 10/24/1997 Fair filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9291

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

FAIR, WOODROW W.

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

HARRIS, YOLANDA

HARRIS, NATHANIAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LAGOS, PANOS

 

Court Documents

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed

3/19/1998: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

3/19/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

12/2/1997: Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

Order Denying Stay of Execution Filed

11/10/1997: Order Denying Stay of Execution Filed

Application for Stay of Execution Filed for Nathanial Harris

11/10/1997: Application for Stay of Execution Filed for Nathanial Harris

Judgment Default: Clerk CCP 1169 Entered

11/5/1997: Judgment Default: Clerk CCP 1169 Entered

Request for Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed for Woodrow W. Fair , Nathania

11/5/1997: Request for Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed for Woodrow W. Fair , Nathania

Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed

11/5/1997: Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed

Summons with Proof of Service As to Woodrow W. Fair , Nathanial Harris , Yolanda Harris Fil

11/5/1997: Summons with Proof of Service As to Woodrow W. Fair , Nathanial Harris , Yolanda Harris Fil

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

10/24/1997: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Satisfied Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying Stay of Execution Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1997
  • DocketApplication for Stay of Execution Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Stay of Execution Filed for Nathanial Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 03/19/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default: Clerk CCP 1169 Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • DocketRequest for Judgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169/Money Pending Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • DocketJudgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed for Woodrow W. Fair , Nathania

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service Valid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to Woodrow W. Fair , Nathanial Harris , Yolanda Harris Fil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less