Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 00:58:41 (UTC).

Facciola VS All Saintsidence OPCO, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Facciola filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against All Saintsidence OPCO, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7335

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FACCIOLA, PHILIP

MURRAY, SUZETTE

BAILEY, FRANCESCA

FACCIOLA, VIRGINIA

FACCIOLA, PHILIP M. JR.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALL SAINTSIDENCE OPCO, LLC

CENTRAL VALLEY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, INC.

REDDY, MANJULA M.D

Cross Defendant

FACCIOLA, CHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CURRAN, FELICIA C.

STOUTENBURG, DANIELA P.

GATES, SARAH P

DODD, JOHN H.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/18/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Entry of Default Against Cheryl Facciola Filed

4/7/2021: Notice of Entry of Default Against Cheryl Facciola Filed

Amended Notice of Entry of Default Filed

4/8/2021: Amended Notice of Entry of Default Filed

Motion - Motion Rescheduled

3/11/2021: Motion - Motion Rescheduled

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

1/25/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

1/20/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

12/1/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint Filed for Central Valley Specialty Hospital, Inc.

2/11/2020: Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint Filed for Central Valley Specialty Hospital, Inc.

Second Amended Complaint Filed

1/16/2020: Second Amended Complaint Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Virginia Facciola, Francesca Bailey, Philip Facc

12/12/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Virginia Facciola, Francesca Bailey, Philip Facc

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

11/7/2019: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

12/3/2019: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/11/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/17/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

5/3/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 09/17/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/3/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Philip Facciola

5/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Philip Facciola

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

5/2/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Entry of Default Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Default Against Cheryl Facciola Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 521 date: 04/01/2021 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/10/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/17/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Philip Facciola

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL VALLEY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL SAINTSIDENCE OPCO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GATES, SARAH P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DODD, JOHN H.