This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/22/2020 at 11:33:16 (UTC).

Evans VS Maximo Investments

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Evans filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Maximo Investments. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6746

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EVANS, LEONARD R.

JOSEPH, DONALD J

Defendants

ROSEN, JAY

RANDALL, IRA DR.

ROSEN, ROS

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS

 

Court Documents

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/26/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leonard R. Evans

9/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leonard R. Evans

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

9/26/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/27/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

9/27/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 03/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

Civil Ex-Parte 10/16/2019 03:30 PM D- 20

10/1/2019: Civil Ex-Parte 10/16/2019 03:30 PM D- 20

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/1/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

9/27/2019: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

10/16/2019: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

10/16/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Lis Pendens Filed

10/29/2019: Lis Pendens Filed

Order Voiding Filings of Donald J Joseph entered

11/8/2019: Order Voiding Filings of Donald J Joseph entered

Order Voiding Filings of Leonard R. Evans entered

12/23/2019: Order Voiding Filings of Leonard R. Evans entered

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase Administratively Voided Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Voiding Filings of Leonard R. Evans entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Voiding Filings of Donald J Joseph entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Leonard R. Evans Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing 11/04/2019 09:30 AM D- FHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Leonard R. Evans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Other Ex Parte; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Leonard R. Evans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Donald J Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leonard R. Evans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAXIMO INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant