This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 00:59:32 (UTC).

EVANS VS CRANE CO

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 EVANS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CRANE CO. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN, EVELIO GRILLO, JO-LYNNE Q. LEE and HARRY JACOBS. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1954

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

EVELIO GRILLO

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

HARRY JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EVANS, MARGARET

EVANS, CRAIG

Defendants

WESTBURN SUPPLY, INC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC

LAMONS GASKET COMPAN

3M COMPANY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC

COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING COMPANY

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

CRANE CO

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

CHEVRON U.S.A INC

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R.

ASPERICUETA, ERIKA R.

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

CAMPAGNE, INGRID T.

PETTY, ROSS M.

ADAMS, JOSEPH B.

LEE, JENNIFER J

REYNOLDS, RICHARD L.

PRZETAK, LAURA

PRINDLE, KENNETH B.

DUMONT, RICHARD D.

BOONE, MORDECAI D

MCMEEL, MEGHAN R.

LOVE, MARK A

WAH, DOUGLAS G.

MCCORMICK, JENNIFER M.

EAGAN JR, MICHAEL Q.

POND, FRANK D.

LIN, CARRIE S

HUGO, JOHN T

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/7/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

4/16/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/11/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/11/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/18/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Tentative Case Management Order

9/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC Filed

9/15/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Sun Ship, LLC Filed

9/15/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Sun Ship, LLC Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

9/15/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

9/15/2021: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/10/2021: Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

9/13/2021: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

(*Email Notification of Settlement by PLT rcvd' by D-302 on 09/13/21) Filed

9/13/2021: (*Email Notification of Settlement by PLT rcvd' by D-302 on 09/13/21) Filed

Settlement Conference Statement of Douglass Insulation Company, Inc. Filed

9/8/2021: Settlement Conference Statement of Douglass Insulation Company, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY File

9/9/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY File

221 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Pretrial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Sun Ship, LLC Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Sun Ship, LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Settlement Conference; Judge: Harry Jacobs; Department: Dept 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 11/01/2021 08:30 AM D- 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/04/2022 10:00 AM D- 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
292 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to 3M COMPANY Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to LAMONS GASKET COMPAN Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to SANTA FE BRAUN, INC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to CHEVRON U.S.A INC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/16/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 08/14/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CRAIG EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less