Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 22:57:54 (UTC).

Evans VS Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 Evans filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2953

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUNA , JAIME

HENRY , OFELIA

AUSTIN , VICTORIA

ANDREW , JAMES

KNOEFLER , SARAH

WYATT , DEBBIE

HAUGE , COLIN

MATTHEWS , DONALD

MILLER , ANNA

EVANS , KIMBERLY

HENIOWITZ , JASON

BEGGS , ELISA

BOND , CAROLYN

HEINICKE , LINDA

HENNESSY , JAMI

BRONSON , DARLENE

Defendants

BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY

MCKESSON CORPORATION

OTSUKA PHARACEUTICAL CO.,LTD.

OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL,INC.

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RIZKALLA, RUTH

MAYO, SHARON D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 08/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

5/2/2018: Case Management Conference 08/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

Motion Dropped

6/19/2018: Motion Dropped

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/7/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complex Determination Hearing 01/22/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

12/10/2018: Complex Determination Hearing 01/22/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/11/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Submission Of Petition For Coordination And Declaration Of Service Filed

12/18/2018: Notice of Submission Of Petition For Coordination And Declaration Of Service Filed

Notice of Remand Filed

12/18/2018: Notice of Remand Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

1/7/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Otsuka America Pharmac

1/18/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Otsuka America Pharmac

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

2/26/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Miscellaneous order assigning coordination motion judge and setting hearing. Filed

3/1/2019: Miscellaneous order assigning coordination motion judge and setting hearing. Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

4/30/2019: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of of Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge Filed

5/8/2019: Notice of of Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kimberly Evans

4/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kimberly Evans

Complaint - Mass Tort Filed

4/30/2018: Complaint - Mass Tort Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/30/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Removal Filed for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

5/4/2018: Notice of Removal Filed for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Proof of Service Filed

5/4/2018: Proof of Service Filed

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 06/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Coordination with JCCP. 4998 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Report on Status of Petition For Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous order assigning coordination motion judge and setting hearing. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Complex Determination Hearing 03/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal Filed for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal Filed for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 08/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 06/19/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Mass Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kimberly Evans

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bristol-Myers Squibb Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant