This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:29:18 (UTC).

Estevez VS Smart & Final, Inc

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Estevez filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Smart Final, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES REILLY and HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7274

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES REILLY

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTEVEZ, ERICK

Erick Estevez

Defendants

SMART & FINAL, INC

US FOOD, INC.

SMART AND FINAL STORES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KLECZEK, DAVID A

ALDRICH, THEODORE F.

David A Kleczek

Theodore F. Aldrich

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/5/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

2/3/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/26/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration of Service by Mail

08/05/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

06/04/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

01/21/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Case Management Conference Order Issued

08/05/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

08/05/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party US Food, Inc. Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to party

08/02/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party US Food, Inc. Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to party

Case Management Statement of Smart & Final, Inc Filed

07/22/2021: Case Management Statement of Smart & Final, Inc Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Smart & Final, Inc

07/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Smart & Final, Inc

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

07/08/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

06/09/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

06/04/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

02/03/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Address for Theodore F. Aldrich (Attorney) null; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Theodore F. Aldrich (Attorney):Organization Name changed from WOLFE & WYMAN to WOLFE & WYMAN LLPName Suffix: blank; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: Smart & Final, Inc (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Event scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Type changed from Pre-Trial Settlement Conference to Pre-Trial Conference; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notes: Jury Deposit fee paid by Smart and Final; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/15/2023 09:00 AM D- 303; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance 03/03/2023 11:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Jury Trial 03/13/2023 09:30 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Erick Estevez Granted; Category: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Erick Estevez; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Erick Estevez; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLECZEK, DAVID A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDRICH, THEODORE F.