This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 00:07:11 (UTC).

Estate of Sammie Leroy Morris Sr.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2007 Estate of Sammie Leroy Morris Sr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDREW STECKLER, WILLIAM A. MCKINSTRY, CECILIA P. CASTELLANOS, CARL W. MORRIS, THOMAS M. REARDON, SANDRA K. BEAN, MARSHALL WHITLEY, RICHARD KELLER, C. DON CLAY and PHILLIP CAMPBELL, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7626

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANDREW STECKLER

WILLIAM A. MCKINSTRY

CECILIA P. CASTELLANOS

CARL W. MORRIS

THOMAS M. REARDON

SANDRA K. BEAN

MARSHALL WHITLEY

RICHARD KELLER

C. DON CLAY

PHILLIP CAMPBELL, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MORRIS, GERARD

MORRIS, SAMMIE L. JR.

MORRIS, JANIQUE C.

Not Classified By Court

MORRIS, SHIRLEY

MORRIS, MAYNARD

Decedent

MORRIS, SAMMIE LEROY SR.

Other

LONDON, PHYLLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LIEBERMAN, GARY R

LEAHY, DANIEL

BELTRAMO, SHARA E.

KILLIAN, CLINTON

CONNER, ALANA GRICE

 

Court Documents

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Gerard Morris

6/5/2017: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Gerard Morris

Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

6/5/2017: Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt and/or Sanctions Filed

6/5/2017: Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt and/or Sanctions Filed

Declaration of Clinton Killian Filed

6/6/2017: Declaration of Clinton Killian Filed

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

6/6/2017: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

6/6/2017: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

6/6/2017: Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Phyllis London

6/29/2017: Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Phyllis London

Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Gerard Morris

6/29/2017: Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Gerard Morris

Proposed Order Received

6/30/2017: Proposed Order Received

Civil Ex-Parte 07/05/2017 02:00 PM D- 202

6/30/2017: Civil Ex-Parte 07/05/2017 02:00 PM D- 202

Objection Objection to Allow Personal Representative to Sub for Decedent Filed

7/5/2017: Objection Objection to Allow Personal Representative to Sub for Decedent Filed

Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/5/2017: Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

7/5/2017: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied

7/5/2017: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

7/5/2017: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

7/5/2017: Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed

7/6/2017: Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketMinutes: Other Ex Parte; Judge: Andrew Steckler; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketMinutes: Continuance of Trial Date; Judge: Andrew Steckler; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Judge: Andrew Steckler; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2007
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed Filed by Janique C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition for Probate for 12/26/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Judge: Carl W. Morris; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • DocketHearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 12/26/2007 time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition for Probate FOR 11/7/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWill Dated 05-02-1985 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2007
  • DocketProbate 11/07/2007 09:30 AM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNER, ALANA GRICE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBERMAN, GARY R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KILLIAN, CLINTON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leahy, Daniel J., Esq.