Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 15:46:09 (UTC).

Estate of Rahul Patel VS Washington Township Health Care Dis

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 Estate of Rahul Patel filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Washington Township Health Care Dis. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. MARKMAN, WINIFRED Y. SMITH and JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2545

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

PATEL, KOMAL

ESTATE OF RAHUL PATEL

PATEL, SHREYA

Defendants and Others

WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT

KANTAMUNENI, M.D., UMA

LENCHNER, M.D., JEFFREY

AHMAD, M.D., SHAHZAD

WASHINGTON HOSPITAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM

KUDARAVALLI, M.D., PADMAVATHI

SHARIA, M.D., CYRUS

ARORA, M.D., ROHIT

HYDER, M.D., SHAKIR

KANTAMUNENI, M.D., UMA D.

SHARIAT, M.D., CYRUS

HARDEN, R.N., DOROTHY

HALL, R.N., JOYA

MATTHEW, R.N., NEENI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORRIS, KELSEY F.

DEPOLO, DAVID A.

TABARI, CYRUS A.

DEPOLO ESQ, DAVID A.

STILL ESQ, JENNIFER

SHUEY, DAVID T

TANIMASA, CHRISTOPHER A

STILL, THOMAS E.

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 04/02/2018 09:00 AM D- 16

11/17/2017: Initial Case Management Conference 04/02/2018 09:00 AM D- 16

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/2/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/2/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/2/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

8/6/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

2/20/2020: Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/21/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Cyrus Shariat, M.D.

10/15/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Cyrus Shariat, M.D.

Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed

8/22/2019: Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

2/13/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued

10/17/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued

Reply Filed

9/25/2018: Reply Filed

Opposition Filed

5/16/2018: Opposition Filed

Reply to Omnibus Opposition to Pltf's Second Amended Complaint Filed

5/21/2018: Reply to Omnibus Opposition to Pltf's Second Amended Complaint Filed

Motion to Strike Granted

5/29/2018: Motion to Strike Granted

Case Management Statement of Uma D. Kantamuneni, M.D. Filed

6/6/2018: Case Management Statement of Uma D. Kantamuneni, M.D. Filed

Case Management Statement of Washington Township Health Care District, Washington Hospital Healthcar

8/2/2018: Case Management Statement of Washington Township Health Care District, Washington Hospital Healthcar

326 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint Medical Malpractice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Washington Township Health Care District Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Washington Township Health Care District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Rohit Arora, M.D. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Rohit Arora, M.D. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
460 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Estate of Rahul Patel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem As to Komal Patel Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/02/2018 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Komal Patel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Estate of Rahul Patel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where WASHINGTON HOSPITAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, A CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Still, Jennifer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUEY, DAVID T