This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 17:07:48 (UTC).

Estate of John Russell LaFavor Jr

Case Summary

On 05/23/2008 Estate of John Russell LaFavor Jr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEITH FUDENNA and RUBIN SUNDEEN,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9140

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

KEITH FUDENNA

RUBIN SUNDEEN,

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAFAVOR, JOSEPH E

Decedent

LAFAVOR, JOHN RUSSELL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RUBINSTEIN, JOEL K

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

5/23/2008: Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

Proof of Publication As to Joseph E LaFavor Filed

6/9/2008: Proof of Publication As to Joseph E LaFavor Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

6/11/2008: Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph E LaFavor

6/25/2008: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph E LaFavor

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

7/11/2008: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Letters of Administration Filed

7/11/2008: Letters of Administration Filed

Order Appointing Administrator Joseph E LaFavor Filed

7/11/2008: Order Appointing Administrator Joseph E LaFavor Filed

Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed

10/16/2008: Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed

Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/7/2008: Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

Hearing Reset to Probate 07/10/2009 01:55 PM D- 602

3/4/2009: Hearing Reset to Probate 07/10/2009 01:55 PM D- 602

Inventory and Appraisal Filed

3/25/2009: Inventory and Appraisal Filed

Waiver of Account by Vickie Sue Meyer Filed by Joseph E LaFavor

3/25/2009: Waiver of Account by Vickie Sue Meyer Filed by Joseph E LaFavor

Waiver of Account by Joseph E Lafavor Filed by Joseph E LaFavor

3/25/2009: Waiver of Account by Joseph E Lafavor Filed by Joseph E LaFavor

Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Joseph E LaFavor

4/7/2009: Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Joseph E LaFavor

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph E LaFavor

4/17/2009: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph E LaFavor

Proposed Judgment Received

4/17/2009: Proposed Judgment Received

Examiner's Notes: Distribution ON 5/22/2009

5/14/2009: Examiner's Notes: Distribution ON 5/22/2009

Declaration Filed

5/20/2009: Declaration Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketProbate Hearing Dropped from dept: 602 date: 07/10/2009 time: 01:55 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketDropped compliance heariang on 7/10/09; petition for final distribution prev. granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Final Distribution; Judge: Keith Fudenna; Department: Dept 602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Judgment Granting Waiver of Account, Statuatory Fees & Final Distribution Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • DocketFinal Distribution Approved - Waiver of Accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketTentative Pregrant - on petition for final distribution on 5/22/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Distribution ON 5/22/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2008
  • DocketAdministrator Appointed Joseph E LaFavor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketTentative Pregrant - pet'n for probate on 7/11/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joseph E LaFavor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication As to Joseph E LaFavor Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • DocketProbate 07/11/2008 02:00 PM D- 602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less