This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 09:02:36 (UTC).

Estate of Frank Garcia

Case Summary

On 12/19/2006 Estate of Frank Garcia was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEITH FUDENNA and DUANE LEONARD,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2815

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fremont Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

KEITH FUDENNA

DUANE LEONARD,

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAYS, FRANCINE

Decedent

GARCIA, FRANK

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

12/19/2006: Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

Waiver of Bond Filed

12/19/2006: Waiver of Bond Filed

Proof of Publication As to Francine Mays Filed

1/3/2007: Proof of Publication As to Francine Mays Filed

Order Appointing Administrator Francine Mays Filed

2/23/2007: Order Appointing Administrator Francine Mays Filed

Proposed Order Received

10/17/2007: Proposed Order Received

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

10/17/2007: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

Notice of Proposed Action Independent Admin of Estate - Objection from Cynthia R Martinez & Shirley

12/17/2007: Notice of Proposed Action Independent Admin of Estate - Objection from Cynthia R Martinez & Shirley

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

1/10/2008: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

1/10/2008: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

1/10/2008: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

Miscellaneous Request for Prior Notice to All Heirs Filed

4/7/2008: Miscellaneous Request for Prior Notice to All Heirs Filed

Examiner's Notes: Distribution ---REVISED---for 4/11/08 hearing

4/7/2008: Examiner's Notes: Distribution ---REVISED---for 4/11/08 hearing

Declaration of Francine Mays, Admin in response to examiner's checklist Filed

4/9/2008: Declaration of Francine Mays, Admin in response to examiner's checklist Filed

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

4/15/2008: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

6/13/2008: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

7/7/2008: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

Receipt on Distribution by Party Brenda Cruz Filed

12/12/2008: Receipt on Distribution by Party Brenda Cruz Filed

Decree Final Discharge Filed

1/28/2010: Decree Final Discharge Filed

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Final Discharge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution by Party Francine Mays Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution by Party Michael Garcia Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution by Party Brenda Cruz Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution by Party by Shirley Garcia Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution by Party Cynthia Martinez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for First and Final Accounting; Judge: Keith Fudenna; Department: Dept 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for First and Final Accounting Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketFinal Distribution Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Examiner's Check List Petn for Probate set for 2/23 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication As to Francine Mays Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Francine Mays

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • DocketProbate 02/23/2007 02:00 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less