This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 12:27:30 (UTC).

Estate of DINA E. PIMENTEL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 Estate of DINA E PIMENTEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUBEN SUNDEEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5571

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RUBEN SUNDEEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PIMENTEL, STEPHEN G.

Decedent

PIMENTEL, DINA E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEAHY, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

6/23/2020: Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

Letters of Administration Filed

8/6/2020: Letters of Administration Filed

Order Appointing Administrator Filed

8/5/2020: Order Appointing Administrator Filed

Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/5/2020: Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate Hearing 8/5/20

8/3/2020: Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate Hearing 8/5/20

Proof of Publication As to Stephen G. Pimentel Filed

7/22/2020: Proof of Publication As to Stephen G. Pimentel Filed

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed

7/17/2020: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

7/17/2020: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Letters of Administration; Judge: Ruben Sundeen; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Administrator Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketAdministrator Appointed Stephen G. Pimentel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition for Probate Hearing 8/5/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication As to Stephen G. Pimentel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketProbate 08/05/2020 02:00 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leahy, Daniel J., Esq.