This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 18:37:13 (UTC).

Estate of Darlene Metcalfe

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Estate of Darlene Metcalfe was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDRA K. BEAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3473

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

SANDRA K. BEAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

METCALFE, RYAN

Decedent

METCALFE, DARLENE

Not Classified By Court

MONTESDEOCA, DEBORAH DARLENE

Other

PENDERGRASS , PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SUMMERALL, SARAH

DUBIN, MICHAEL A.

LEVILOFF, DARIN A

REED, JAMES E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

12/28/2020: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

12/21/2020: Petition for Letters of Administration Filed

Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 2/17/21

2/4/2021: Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 2/17/21

Proof of Publication As to Ryan Metcalfe Filed

1/21/2021: Proof of Publication As to Ryan Metcalfe Filed

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

2/17/2021: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 2/17/21

2/4/2021: Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 2/17/21

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

4/16/2021: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 4/16/21

4/8/2021: Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 4/16/21

Objection to Petition for Letters of Administration Filed for Deborah Darlene Montesdeoca

3/22/2021: Objection to Petition for Letters of Administration Filed for Deborah Darlene Montesdeoca

Response to Objection Filed by Deborah Darlene Montesdeoca Filed

6/9/2021: Response to Objection Filed by Deborah Darlene Montesdeoca Filed

Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 6/16/21

6/8/2021: Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 6/16/21

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

6/16/2021: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on 8/18/2021

8/6/2021: Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on 8/18/2021

Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

8/18/2021: Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued

Request for Special Notice Filed for Third Party

8/17/2021: Request for Special Notice Filed for Third Party

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Ryan Metcalfe

8/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Ryan Metcalfe

Hearing Reset to Probate 11/29/2021 09:45 AM D- 202

9/20/2021: Hearing Reset to Probate 11/29/2021 09:45 AM D- 202

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 202; Action: Petition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 11/29/2021 09:45 AM D- 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Letters of Administration; Judge: Sandra K. Bean; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Probate dept: 202 date: 11/10/2021 time: 09:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice Filed for Third Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Ryan Metcalfe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition for Probate on 8/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Letters of Administration; Judge: Sandra K. Bean; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Probate dept: 202 date: 08/18/2021 time: 09:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 4/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection to Petition for Letters of Administration Filed for Deborah Darlene Montesdeoca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Letters of Administration; Judge: Sandra K. Bean; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Probate dept: 202 date: 04/16/2021 time: 09:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Petition for Probate set on 2/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication As to Ryan Metcalfe Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProbate 02/17/2021 09:45 AM D- 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUBIN, MICHAEL A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED, JAMES E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUMMERALL, SARAH