This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 09:54:38 (UTC).

Esqueda VS Pablo

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Esqueda filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pablo. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KARIN S SCHWARTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4245

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESQUEDA , JEFFREY

Defendants

PABLO , RICARDO MARTIN

JCW INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

9/9/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

9/9/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 09/09/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

8/21/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 09/09/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/20/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

7/23/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Jeffrey Esqueda

7/23/2020: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Jeffrey Esqueda

Request Re: Postponement Denied

7/29/2020: Request Re: Postponement Denied

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/30/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Trial Brief Filed

8/10/2020: Trial Brief Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

8/12/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

4/10/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/29/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

3/4/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/29/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Request to Postpone Trial Filed

1/27/2020: Request to Postpone Trial Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

1/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Proof of Service Non Service Report Filed

12/31/2019: Proof of Service Non Service Report Filed

Request for Postpone Trial Filed

12/31/2019: Request for Postpone Trial Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 02/10/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

12/31/2019: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 02/10/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/21/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketInterpreter Request Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service trial Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 09/09/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 106 date: 09/09/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/29/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 02/10/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Postpone Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Non Service Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 01/09/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less