This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 10:06:17 (UTC).

Environmental Health Advocate VS THe Kroger Co. an Ohio corp

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Environmental Health Advocate filed an Other lawsuit against THe Kroger Co an Ohio corp. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3383

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC.

Defendants

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION

THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GLICK, NOAM

O'HARA, GREGORY P

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint Filed for The Kroger Co. an Ohio corporation

8/9/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for The Kroger Co. an Ohio corporation

Answer to Complaint Filed for Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio corporation

8/9/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio corporation

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

8/13/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio corporation Filed

7/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio corporation Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Kroger Co. an Ohio corporation Filed

7/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Kroger Co. an Ohio corporation Filed

Complaint - Other Filed

6/24/2021: Complaint - Other Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.

6/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/24/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 11/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

7/2/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/2/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for The Kroger Co. an Ohio corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The Kroger Co. an Ohio corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA ORGANIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'HARA, GREGORY P