Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/13/2020 at 05:34:23 (UTC).

English VS Duscha

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 English filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Duscha. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3016

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENGLISH , WALTER

Defendant

DUSCHA , MELISSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCKISSICK, ROSS

WALDRON, JEFF

VUKAS, CHELAN

MANDAL, CHANDRANI

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

7/16/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Melissa Duscha

4/27/2020: Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Melissa Duscha

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

5/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/27/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Release of Funds Issued and Filed

1/29/2020: Release of Funds Issued and Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Melissa Duscha

11/12/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Melissa Duscha

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/10/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Walter English

1/13/2020: Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Walter English

Case Management Statement of Walter English Filed

1/13/2020: Case Management Statement of Walter English Filed

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed

1/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Melissa Duscha Filed

8/26/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Melissa Duscha Filed

Case Management Statement of Walter English Filed

10/18/2019: Case Management Statement of Walter English Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/28/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

6/14/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Walter English

6/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Walter English

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/14/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 11/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

6/17/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 11/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Melissa Duscha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease of Funds Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/26/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Melissa Duscha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Walter English Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Melissa Duscha Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Walter English

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vukas, Chelan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Waldron, Jeff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKISSICK, ROSS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDAL, CHANDRANI