This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 03:01:34 (UTC).

Englander VS Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 Englander filed an Other lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EVELIO GRILLO, BRAD SELIGMAN and BRENDA HARBIN-FORTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9706

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

EVELIO GRILLO

BRAD SELIGMAN

BRENDA HARBIN-FORTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

ENGLANDER, PETER

Defendants, Debtor / Appellees and Cross Plaintiffs

WAL-MART STORES, INC.

WALMART INC.

SAM'S WEST, INC.

Cross Defendant

NINGBO MEIQI TOOL CO. LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JOHNSON, BRIAN C.

BOURNAZIAN, J. DAVID

VOORHEES, JOSH

PARAS, LARALEI S

BOURNAZIAN, J.

VANWYNGARDEN, THOMAS L.

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 03/07/2018 09:15 AM D- 15

10/26/2017: Initial Case Management Conference 03/07/2018 09:15 AM D- 15

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/7/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/7/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/05/2018 03:00 PM D- 30

4/18/2018: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/05/2018 03:00 PM D- 30

Returned Mail: Initial Case Management Order Filed

5/3/2018: Returned Mail: Initial Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/5/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/5/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/17/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/17/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Judgment Entire Action Filed

9/17/2019: Judgment Entire Action Filed

Judgment Entered

9/17/2019: Judgment Entered

Case Management Conf Continuance 08/06/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

7/19/2019: Case Management Conf Continuance 08/06/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

Order Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Filed

5/20/2019: Order Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

3/26/2019: Tentative Case Management Order

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

2/22/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

First Amended Complaint Filed

1/4/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Filed

2/20/2018: Case Management Statement of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Filed

Returned Mail: Order Filed

5/3/2018: Returned Mail: Order Filed

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Debtor: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc., Sam's West, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Walmart Inc., Sam's West, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc., Sam'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketTR - Motion - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Motion; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Peter Englander Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Complex Designation Request Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other As to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/07/2018 09:15 AM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Peter Englander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less