This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 05:17:39 (UTC).

Endriss VS Samuel Merritt University

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Endriss filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Samuel Merritt University. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3321

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEGOVIA , NATALLY

ENDRISS , SARAH

Defendants

BOTHA , ELMARE

SAMUEL MERRITT UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JAMBECK, JAY T.

HERNAEZ, ALEX

JUNG, HYUNKI

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/25/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 02/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

11/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 02/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/17/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Statement of Samuel Merritt University , Elmare Botha Filed

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement of Samuel Merritt University , Elmare Botha Filed

Case Management Statement of Samuel Merritt University Filed

2/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Samuel Merritt University Filed

Case Management Statement of Sarah Endriss, Natally Segovia Filed

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement of Sarah Endriss, Natally Segovia Filed

Status Report ( Joint) Filed

6/16/2020: Status Report ( Joint) Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Samuel Merritt University , Elmare Botha

6/29/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Samuel Merritt University , Elmare Botha

Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Sarah Endriss, Natally Segovia - the proceedings

5/4/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Sarah Endriss, Natally Segovia - the proceedings

Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted

5/29/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted

Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

2/5/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/5/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/4/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sarah Endriss

2/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sarah Endriss

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/09/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Samuel Merritt University , Elmare Botha Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Attorney Hyunki (John) Jung Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney Liku Madoshi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Report (Joint) of the parties Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Report ( Joint) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder -Joint Stipulation of the Parties to Stay the Proceeding and Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Sarah Endriss, Natally Segovia - the proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sarah Endriss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAMUEL MERRITT UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMBECK, JAY T.