This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/22/2020 at 13:33:03 (UTC).

Embry VS Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Embry filed an Other lawsuit against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4772

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMBRY, KIM

Defendants

BULLET WEIGHTS, INC.

DICK'S SPORTING GOODS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GLICK, NOAM

MAIDEN, TODD O.

MARGULIES, JEFFREY B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Filed

12/24/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bullet Weights, Inc. Filed

1/23/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bullet Weights, Inc. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

1/24/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bullet Weights, Inc. Filed

1/24/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bullet Weights, Inc. Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

2/6/2020: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Bullet Weights, Inc.

2/13/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Bullet Weights, Inc.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

2/13/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

11/27/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/27/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/26/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kim Embry

11/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kim Embry

Complaint - Other Filed

11/26/2019: Complaint - Other Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Bullet Weights, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/24/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 09/10/2021 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/06/2020 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Bullet Weights, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Bullet Weights, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kim Embry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.