This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 03:57:27 (UTC).

Eckstein VS Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 Eckstein filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, George E Mcdonald Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. MARKMAN, NOEL WISE and NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6288

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    George E Mcdonald Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

NOEL WISE

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ECKSTEIN, MARY ELIZABETH P.

ECKSTEIN, ROBERT B.

Defendants

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

COMMUNITY FUND, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ULLOA, ADELA Z.

LARSEN, TIMOTHY A.

BAILEY, ROBERT A.

ROSS, BRIAN K

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/23/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/24/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/15/2017: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/15/2017: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/24/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/15/2017 09:00 AM D- 16

8/23/2017: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/15/2017 09:00 AM D- 16

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/23/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/20/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/10/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

10/29/2019: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/10/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

Case Management Statement of Mary Elizabeth P. Eckstein, Robert B. Eckstein Filed

4/9/2018: Case Management Statement of Mary Elizabeth P. Eckstein, Robert B. Eckstein Filed

Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

10/2/2018: Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

10/30/2017: Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/15/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

11/29/2017: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

4/10/2018: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/5/2017: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/10/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 12/13/2019 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 11/14/2019 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 11/01/2019 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 12/06/2019 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 12/16/2019 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Mary Elizabeth P. Eckstein, Robert B. Eckstein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss LLP, a California Limite

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to George E. McDonald Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/15/2017 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mary Elizabeth P. Eckstein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less